Senate | 05/17/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Enrolled | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1166 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Pending House Judiciary | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 224 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Pending Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |