House | 05/02/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Pending House Ways and Means Education | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 539 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Givhan motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 538 8EEYFFF-1 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Givhan 1st Amendment Offered 8EEYFFF-1 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Coleman motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 537 NUID888-1 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute Offered NUID888-1 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute NUID888-1 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |