House | 04/18/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Pending House Commerce and Small Business | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Commerce and Small Business | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 321 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Sessions motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 320 TE6K159-1 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Amendment Offered TE6K159-1 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Amendment TE6K159-1 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |