Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 847
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Carried Over to the Call of the Chair
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Pending House Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 387
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Barfoot motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 386 15Q53Z3-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Barfoot 1st Amendment Offered 15Q53Z3-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Barfoot motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote 9XZWMMM-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Judiciary 1st Amendment Offered 9XZWMMM-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Judiciary 1st Amendment 9XZWMMM-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Pending Senate Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|