Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference Committee Substitute Adopted ZVSFKWK-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Shedd Accede - Adopted Voice Vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Reed Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee - Adopted Roll Call 662
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 683
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 682 MME3HWW-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Fidler 1st Amendment Offered MME3HWW-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 681 P3I9ERG-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Shedd 1st Amendment Offered P3I9ERG-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 680 P7Y9EER-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Fiscal Responsibility Engrossed Substitute Offered P7Y9EER-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House from House Fiscal Responsibility P7Y9EER-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Fiscal Responsibility 1st Amendment R3PCMYM-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Pending House Fiscal Responsibility
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Fiscal Responsibility
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 361
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Orr motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 360 LXBGWAW-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Orr 1st Amendment Offered LXBGWAW-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Coleman motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 359 Z8VGRWK-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Coleman 2nd Amendment Offered Z8VGRWK-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Coleman motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 358 UP7MGGD-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Coleman 1st Amendment Offered UP7MGGD-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Givhan motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 357 YI3U2N6-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Givhan 1st Amendment Offered YI3U2N6-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Givhan motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 356 PMZNEEE-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Amendment Offered PMZNEEE-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Amendment PMZNEEE-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
|
|
|