Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 977
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 976 TFFG591-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Mobile County Legislation Engrossed Substitute Offered TFFG591-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House from House Mobile County Legislation TFFG591-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Mobile County Legislation 1st Amendment UFFQDXG-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Pending House Mobile County Legislation
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Mobile County Legislation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 647
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 646 FXITCDC-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Mobile County Legislation 1st Amendment Offered FXITCDC-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Mobile County Legislation 1st Amendment FXITCDC-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Pending Senate Mobile County Legislation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Mobile County Legislation
|
|
|