House | 05/09/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Chesnutt Motion to Concur in Executive Amendment - Adopted Roll Call 1157 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Reed Motion to Concur in Executive Amendment - Adopted Roll Call 1026 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Pending with Executive Amendment | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Enrolled | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1061 | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Pending House Judiciary | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 684 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Pending Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |