Senate | 05/07/2024 | Currently Indefinitely Postponed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Carried Over to the Call of the Chair | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Pending Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |