Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1042
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1041 NWZXT88-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Mooney 1st Amendment Offered NWZXT88-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1040 7F97EEV-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Ways and Means General Fund Engrossed Substitute Offered 7F97EEV-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House from House Ways and Means General Fund 7F97EEV-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Ways and Means General Fund 2nd Amendment V5W2VVP-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Ways and Means General Fund 1st Amendment 66FY311-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Pending House Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 690
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Chambliss motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 689 CM7HJWJ-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Chambliss 1st Substitute Offered CM7HJWJ-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Carried Over
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Pending Senate County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government
|
|
|