Senate | 04/12/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 386 | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Pending House Insurance | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 106 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Pending Senate Banking and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Banking and Insurance |