Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Engrossed | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 512 | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 511 YMKLT6N-1 | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Shaver 1st Amendment Offered YMKLT6N-1 | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Pending House Ways and Means Education | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |