House | 04/22/2025 | Enacted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Enrolled | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 523 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Pending Senate Veterans, Military Affairs and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 115 | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Pending House Urban and Rural Development | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Urban and Rural Development |