Senate | 04/15/2025 | Carried Over | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Pending Senate Local Legislation | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Engrossed | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 443 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 442 PS1J4RR-1 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Hill 1st Amendment Offered PS1J4RR-1 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 441 L55P3AY-1 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered L55P3AY-1 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Judiciary L55P3AY-1 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Judiciary 1st Amendment FKAU6CC-1 | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Pending House Judiciary | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |