Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Education Policy 1st Amendment 7B55P22-1 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Pending Senate Education Policy | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Engrossed | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 586 | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 585 U9TC9GG-1 | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Education Policy Engrossed Substitute Offered U9TC9GG-1 | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Education Policy U9TC9GG-1 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Education Policy 1st Amendment JPIGAYF-1 | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Pending House Education Policy | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy |