Alabama 2025 Regular Session

Alabama House Bill HB484 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 HB484INTRODUCED
22 Page 0
33 HB484
44 YMKPM6N-1
55 By Representatives Shaw, Hulsey, Underwood, Brown, Wilcox,
66 Lipscomb, Moore (P)
77 RFD: Financial Services
88 First Read: 01-Apr-25
99 1
1010 2
1111 3
1212 4
1313 5
1414 6 YMKPM6N-1 03/18/2025 CD (F)CD 2025-1067
1515 Page 1
1616 First Read: 01-Apr-25
1717 SYNOPSIS:
1818 This bill would require the publication of
1919 certain state expenditures to a public blockchain and
2020 would provide for the creation of a strategic plan to
2121 implement this requirement.
2222 A BILL
2323 TO BE ENTITLED
2424 AN ACT
2525 Relating to the publication of certain state
2626 expenditures to a public blockchain; and to provide for the
2727 creation of a strategic plan to implement this requirement.
2828 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA:
2929 Section 1. The following terms have the following
3030 meanings:
3131 (1) BLOCKCHAIN. Data that is shared across a network to
3232 create a ledger of verified transactions or information among
3333 network participants linked using cryptography to maintain the
3434 integrity of the ledger and to execute other functions and
3535 distributed among network participants in an automated fashion
3636 to concurrently update network participants on the state of
3737 the ledger and any other functions.
3838 (2) PUBLIC EXPENDITURES. Any transfer of monies from
3939 1
4040 2
4141 3
4242 4
4343 5
4444 6
4545 7
4646 8
4747 9
4848 10
4949 11
5050 12
5151 13
5252 14
5353 15
5454 16
5555 17
5656 18
5757 19
5858 20
5959 21
6060 22
6161 23
6262 24
6363 25
6464 26
6565 27
6666 28 HB484 INTRODUCED
6767 Page 2
6868 (2) PUBLIC EXPENDITURES. Any transfer of monies from
6969 the State of Alabama to a private person for the payment of
7070 goods or services that is a public record pursuant to Section
7171 36-12-40, Code of Alabama 1975.
7272 Section 2. (a) Beginning October 1, 2030, the
7373 Comptroller shall publish all public expenditures exceeding
7474 one thousand dollars ($1,000) to a public blockchain, as
7575 provided by rule of the Department of Finance. The Comptroller
7676 may contract with any public or private entity to implement
7777 this act.
7878 (b) No later than September 30, 2027, the Department of
7979 Finance, in consultation with the Office of Information
8080 Technology, shall develop and submit to the Governor a
8181 strategic plan to implement subsection (a).
8282 (c) The strategic plan shall include, but not be
8383 limited to, recommendations to the Legislature on legislation
8484 or funding required to implement this act.
8585 (d) The Governor shall approve the strategic plan by
8686 December 31, 2027. No later than January 10, 2028, the
8787 Department of Finance shall publish a copy of the approved
8888 strategic plan on its website and provide a copy of the plan
8989 to all members of the Legislature.
9090 (e) Nothing in this act shall be construed to require
9191 that the Department of Finance solely use blockchain
9292 technology for the purposes of tracking state expenditures.
9393 Section 3. This act shall become effective on October
9494 1, 2025.
9595 29
9696 30
9797 31
9898 32
9999 33
100100 34
101101 35
102102 36
103103 37
104104 38
105105 39
106106 40
107107 41
108108 42
109109 43
110110 44
111111 45
112112 46
113113 47
114114 48
115115 49
116116 50
117117 51
118118 52
119119 53
120120 54