Alabama 2025 2025 Regular Session

Alabama House Bill HR43 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/11/2025

                    HR43INTRODUCED
Page 0
HR43
KKQRAUA-1
By Representative Sellers
RFD: 
First Read: 11-Feb-25
1
2
3
4
5 KKQRAUA-1 02/06/2025 LMG (L)lmg 2025-624
Page 1
First Read: 11-Feb-25
HR____ MOURNING THE DEATH AND CELEBRATING THE LIFE OF ROLAND
MIXON, SR.
WHEREAS, it is with deep sadness that we note the
death of Roland Mixon, Sr. on February 3, 2025, at the age
of 84; his passing leaves a void in the lives of his loving
family, many friends, and the community, where he was highly
regarded; and 
WHEREAS, Roland Mixon was born on February 10, 1940,
in Birmingham, to the union of Essie Mae and Robuster Mixon;
he graduated from Westfield High School in 1959, and
embarked on a life filled with dedication and hard work; and
WHEREAS, Roland Mixon accepted Christ at an early age
and remained a devoted member of First Missionary Baptist
Church in Hueytown throughout his life; his service to the
church was unwavering, and he faithfully served as a Deacon,
Bass Choir Member, Clothes Closet Member, Evangelism
Ministry Member, and Sunday School Teacher; and 
WHEREAS, he was blessed to marry the love of his
life, Eunice Fay Watkins, on April 11, 1959, and together
they built a loving family, welcoming four children: Janice,
Alesia, Roland, Jr., and Kendra; and
WHEREAS, Roland Mixon was known to be a diligent and
devoted employeee; he worked at Hillman Hospital, U.S.
Pipeshop, Concord Mines, and ultimately at Oak Grove Mine,
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28 HR43 INTRODUCED
Page 2
Pipeshop, Concord Mines, and ultimately at Oak Grove Mine,
where he dedicated over 30 years as a coal miner; his strong
work ethic and commitment to providing for his family were
evident in all that he did; and
WHEREAS, Roland Mixon was preceded in death by his
parents; sister, Annie Ruth Mixon Brown; grandmother,
Mahalia Scott; aunt, Willie Scott Woods; and nephew, Kerry
Mixon, Sr.; and
WHEREAS, he is survived by his loving and cherished
wife of 65 years, Eunice Fay Mixon; children, Janice Towns
(Gregory), Alesia Leggett (Robert), Roland "Mickey" Mixon,
Jr. (Venice), and Kendra Mixon; 11 grandchildren; 11
great-grandchildren; and a host of other much-loved and
devoted close family members and friends; and
WHEREAS, Roland Mixon lived a life of faith, service,
and love; he leaves behind a legacy which will long endure
the passage of time and remain as a comforting memory to all
who were privileged to have known and loved him; now
therefore, 
BE IT RESOLVED BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE
LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA, That the death of Roland Mixon, Sr.
is recorded with deep sadness, and this resolution is
offered in tribute to his life and legacy, along with
heartfelt sympathy to his family, whose grief is shared by
many. 
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36
37
38
39
40
41
42
43
44
45
46
47
48
49
50
51
52