Alabama 2025 2025 Regular Session

Alabama House Bill HR46 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/11/2025

                    HR46INTRODUCED
Page 0
HR46
MU8T11H-1
By Representatives Paramore, Blackshear, Clouse, Lee,
Sorrells, Marques, Brown, Rehm, Hammett, Forte, Sells
RFD: 
First Read: 11-Feb-25
1
2
3
4
5
6 MU8T11H-1 02/06/2025 bm (L)bm 2025-636
Page 1
First Read: 11-Feb-25
HR____ MOURNING THE DEATH OF DONNIE JEFFREY.
WHEREAS, with an overwhelming sense of loss, we mourn
the death, yet celebrate the life, of Dr. Donnie Jeffrey of
Troy, Alabama, whose passing on January 28, 2025, at the age
of 78 years has left a void in the lives of his family and
friends; and 
WHEREAS, born on November 11, 1946, in Oakland,
California, to Wondell Jeffrey and Mae Price Jeffrey, Donnie
Jeffrey grew up in Chesapeake, Virginia, alongside his five
brothers and one sister; on August 25, 1967, he married
Betty Jane Griggs, beginning a loving partnership that
spanned over five decades; and 
WHEREAS, Dr. Jeffrey devoted his life to education
and service; he earned a Bachelor of Science Degree from
Troy University, a Master of Science Degree from the
University of Tennessee, and a Doctor of Philosophy from
Florida State University; in addition to his academic
career, he served honorably in the United States Army for 22
years, including tours during Desert Shield and Desert
Storm; and
WHEREAS, in 1975, Dr. Jeffrey began teaching at
Samson High School before joining Troy University in Troy,
Alabama; over an extraordinary 46-year career at Troy
University, he became a beloved educator, coach, and leader
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28 HR46 INTRODUCED
Page 2
University, he became a beloved educator, coach, and leader
who profoundly impacted the lives of countless students and
colleagues; and
WHEREAS, he was preceded in death by his parents and
oldest brother, Ronnie; and
WHEREAS, Dr. Jeffrey is survived by his devoted wife,
Betty; children, James (Barbara), Chris (Jennifer), and
Rebecca; grandchildren, Danielle, Christopher, Grayson,
Brooke, Kayla, and Logan; five great-grandchildren;
siblings, Vay, Ralph, Bart, Cathy, and Dean; and numerous
nieces and nephews ; and
WHEREAS, a valued member of the community and loved
by many, his passion for life will be remembered fondly; we
join with others to celebrate his life and to mourn his
death; although his presence will be greatly missed, his
memory will be cherished in the hearts and minds of those
who were fortunate to know him; now therefore, 
BE IT RESOLVED BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE
LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA, That the death of Dr. Donnie Jeffrey
is recorded with deep sadness, and even as we mourn his
death and the loss it represents, we also celebrate his
life; this resolution is offered in highest tribute, along
with heartfelt sympathy to his family, whose grief is shared
by many.
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36
37
38
39
40
41
42
43
44
45
46
47
48
49
50
51