House | 04/24/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Health 1st Substitute 5V4NE3M-1 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Pending House Health | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 512 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Melson motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 511 FKIREDC-1 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Melson 1st Amendment Offered FKIREDC-1 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Sessions motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 510 NRDGQJJ-1 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Sessions 1st Amendment Offered NRDGQJJ-1 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Pending Senate Children and Youth Health | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Children and Youth Health |