Senate | 04/29/2025 | Enacted | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Sent to Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1094 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Pending House Judiciary | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 183 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Barfoot motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 182 5TWW6M3-1 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Judiciary 1st Amendment Offered 5TWW6M3-1 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Judiciary 1st Amendment 5TWW6M3-1 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Pending Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |