Senate | 04/02/2025 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Delivered to Governor | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 524 | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Pending House Ways and Means Education | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 262 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Figures motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 261 2JJFAIS-1 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Figures 1st Amendment Offered 2JJFAIS-1 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |