Senate | 05/01/2025 | Delivered to Governor | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1158 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Pending House Economic Development and Tourism | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Economic Development and Tourism | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 810 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Bell motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 809 G3NTECC-1 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute Offered G3NTECC-1 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute G3NTECC-1 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |