Senate | 04/10/2025 | Enacted | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 600 | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Pending House State Government | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 251 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Carnley motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 250 KKD7U5U-1 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Banking and Insurance 1st Amendment Offered KKD7U5U-1 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Banking and Insurance 1st Amendment KKD7U5U-1 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Pending Senate Banking and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Banking and Insurance |