Alabama 2025 Regular Session

Alabama Senate Bill SR54 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/03/2025

                            SR54INTRODUCED
Page 0
SR54
TBDFY59-1
By Senator Waggoner
RFD: 
First Read: 03-Apr-25
1
2
3
4
5 - 2 -
First Read: 03-Apr-25
TBDFY59-1
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR
Thursday, April 3, 2025
SR _____ SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR
BE IT RESOLVED BY THE SENATE OF THE LEGISLATURE OF
ALABAMA, That immediately upon the adoption of this
resolution, the following business, in the order set forth
below, shall be the special and paramount order of business
for the eighteenth legislative day taking precedence over the
regular order of business or any pending or unfinished
business.
Introduction of Bills
House Messages
Reports from Standing Committees
Motions and Resolutions
Uncontested Local Legislation
Page
Senators Orr and Chesteen: 
31
SB85
Vaccines; religious exemption for K-12 students, further
provided for; religious exemption for students at public
institutions of higher education, provided
Representative Treadaway: 
25
HB168
Local emergency management organizations; mutual aid
agreements with other public and private agencies
Senator Chambliss: 
14
SB174 w/amend
Business taxes, requires annual reports from counties and
municipalities, provides for causes of action, and revises the
jurisdiction of the Alabama Tax Tribunal
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36
37
38
39
40
41
42
43
44
45
46
47 SR54 INTRODUCED
- 3 -
jurisdiction of the Alabama Tax Tribunal
Representative Underwood: 
20
HB27
Sex offenders; restricted employment and volunteer provisions
further provided for
Representatives Lee, Sells, Fidler, Holk-Jones and Warren: 
7
HB160
Alabama Municipal Electric Authority; director compensation
revised
Representative Underwood: 
31
HB250 w/amend
Candidates; revise statement of economic interests filing
requirements..
Representatives Baker and Wood (D): 
26
HB191 w/amend
Relating to Sales and Use Tax; to establish conditions for
exemption of county or municipal sales and use tax
Senator Melson: 
32
SB43 w/sub
Health care providers; prohibit enforcement of contractual
terms that restrict sharing cost information to patients and
consumers
Senators Givhan and Smitherman: 
51
SB197 w/amend
Alabama Business and Nonprofit Entity Code revised;  makes
technical changes and corrects references, and codifies
practices relating to electronic filing and name reservations
48
49
50
51
52
53
54
55
56
57
58
59
60
61
62
63
64
65
66
67
68
69
70
71
72
73
74
75
76
77
78
79
80
81
82
83
84
85
86
87
88
89
90 SR54 INTRODUCED
- 4 -
Representatives Pringle and Wilcox: 
39
HB109
Sunset Law; State Board of Podiatry continued with
modification until October 1, 2029
Representatives Pringle and Wilcox: 
39
HB108
Sunset Law; Alabama Board of Examiners for Speech-Language
Pathology and Audiology continued without modification until
October 1, 2029
Representatives Shedd and Wilcox: 
35
HB113
Sunset Law; Alabama Manufactured Housing Commission continued
without modification until October 1, 2029
Representatives Simpson and Wilcox: 
35
HB115
Sunset Law; Alabama Board of Electrical Contractors continued
without modification until October 1, 2026
Representatives Simpson and Wilcox: 
36
HB117
Sunset Law; Alabama Board of Examiners in Marriage and Family
Therapy continued with modification until October 1, 2027
91
92
93
94
95
96
97
98
99
100
101
102
103
104
105
106
107
108
109
110
111
112
113
114
115
116
117
118
119
120
121
122
123
124
125
126
127
128