Senate | 09/15/2023 | Notification that SB3 is now Act 4 | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | ORDERED ENROLLED | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Returned from the House as passed. | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Returned To the Senate as passed. | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Returned by the Committee Do Pass | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | ||
Senate | 09/12/2023 | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2023 | Read the third time and passed. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2023 | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | ||
Senate | 09/11/2023 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2023 | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Filed |