House
|
02/03/2023
|
Notification that HB1014 is now Act 33
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
TO BE ENROLLED
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Returned From the Senate as passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Returned to the House as passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Read the third time and passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Received from the House.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Returned by the Committee Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
The vote by which HB1014 Failed to Pass was expunged.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Read the third time and failed.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|