House
|
04/13/2023
|
Notification that HB1020 is now Act 795
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
TO BE ENROLLED
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Re-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned to the House as passed, as amended # 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read the third time and passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Received from the House.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Returned by the Committee Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|