House | 02/14/2023 | Notification that HB1183 is now Act 64 | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | TO BE ENROLLED | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Returned From the Senate as passed. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Returned to the House as passed. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Read the third time and passed. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Received from the House. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Returned by the Committee Do Pass | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Filed |