LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arkansas AR
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1302
Draft Versions
AR
Arkansas House Bill HB1302
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arkansas 2023 Regular Session
Arkansas House Bill HB1302
Drafts & Versions
Chaptered
Bill
April 17, 2023
Compare
Draft
Bill
April 4, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 30, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 6, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 20, 2023
Compare
Bill
January 26, 2023
Compare