3 | 2 | | *CRH143* 03-13-2023 09:49:50 CRH143 |
---|
4 | 3 | | |
---|
5 | 4 | | State of Arkansas As Engrossed: H3/13/23 1 |
---|
6 | 5 | | 94th General Assembly A Bill 2 |
---|
7 | 6 | | Regular Session, 2023 HOUSE BILL 1515 3 |
---|
8 | 7 | | 4 |
---|
9 | 8 | | By: Representative Maddox 5 |
---|
10 | 9 | | By: Senator Rice 6 |
---|
11 | 10 | | 7 |
---|
12 | 11 | | For An Act To Be Entitled 8 |
---|
13 | 12 | | AN ACT TO AMEND THE LAW CONCERNING RETAI L WATER 9 |
---|
14 | 13 | | PROVIDERS AND RELATE D SERVICE; AND FOR O THER 10 |
---|
15 | 14 | | PURPOSES. 11 |
---|
16 | 15 | | 12 |
---|
17 | 16 | | 13 |
---|
18 | 17 | | Subtitle 14 |
---|
19 | 18 | | TO AMEND THE LAW CONCERNING RETAIL WATER 15 |
---|
20 | 19 | | PROVIDERS AND RELATED SERVICE. 16 |
---|
21 | 20 | | 17 |
---|
22 | 21 | | 18 |
---|
23 | 22 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ARKANSAS: 19 |
---|
24 | 23 | | 20 |
---|
25 | 24 | | SECTION 1. Arkansas Code § 14 -234-802(c), concerning the schedule that 21 |
---|
26 | 25 | | a provider is required to use to obtain a rate study and the rate changes 22 |
---|
27 | 26 | | following a rate study, is amended to read as follows: 23 |
---|
28 | 27 | | (c)(1) A provider shall obtain a rate study on the following schedule: 24 |
---|
29 | 28 | | (A) By July 1, 2024, and every five (5) years thereafter 25 |
---|
30 | 29 | | for a provider that serves five hundred (500) or fewer customers; 26 |
---|
31 | 30 | | (B) By July 1, 2025, and every five (5) years thereafter 27 |
---|
32 | 31 | | for a provider that serves five hundred one (501) to one thousand (1,000) 28 |
---|
33 | 32 | | customers; and 29 |
---|
34 | 33 | | (C) By July 1, 2026, and every five (5) years thereafter 30 |
---|
35 | 34 | | for a provider that serves more than one thousand (1,000) customers. 31 |
---|
36 | 35 | | (2)(A) Rates and other revenue dedica ted to the support of the 32 |
---|
37 | 36 | | provider's water system shall adequately address costs for: 33 |
---|
38 | 37 | | (i) Operation and maintenance; 34 |
---|
39 | 38 | | (ii) Debt service; 35 |
---|
40 | 39 | | (iii) Required reserves; 36 As Engrossed: H3/13/23 HB1515 |
---|
41 | 40 | | |
---|
42 | 41 | | 2 03-13-2023 09:49:50 CRH143 |
---|
43 | 42 | | |
---|
44 | 43 | | |
---|
45 | 44 | | (iv) Depreciation; 1 |
---|
46 | 45 | | (v) Future capital expenses; 2 |
---|
47 | 46 | | (vi) An Preparation of an annual audit or agreed -upon 3 |
---|
48 | 47 | | procedures and compilation report as required by law; and 4 |
---|
49 | 48 | | (vii) Other expenses as necessary. 5 |
---|
50 | 49 | | (B)(i) The rates recommended in the rate study that is 6 |
---|
51 | 50 | | obtained and chosen by the provider shall be implemented by the pro vider in 7 |
---|
52 | 51 | | the manner provided under the applicable law for modifying rates. 8 |
---|
53 | 52 | | (ii) Except as provided in subdivision (c)(2)(B)(iii) 9 |
---|
54 | 53 | | of this section, an increase in rates recommended in the rate study shall be 10 |
---|
55 | 54 | | implemented within one (1) year of the receipt of the rate study. 11 |
---|
56 | 55 | | (iii) If recommended rates increase the provider's 12 |
---|
57 | 56 | | rates by fifty percent (50%) or more from the fiscal year before the rate 13 |
---|
58 | 57 | | study was completed, the provider may phase in the rate increase over a two -14 |
---|
59 | 58 | | year period. 15 |
---|
60 | 59 | | (iv) If through the rate study it is recommended 16 |
---|
61 | 60 | | that a series of rate increases be implemented over a period of time that 17 |
---|
62 | 61 | | exceeds the periods of time required in subdivision (c)(2)(B)(ii) and (iii) 18 |
---|
63 | 62 | | of this section, the provider may implement the series of rate increas es 19 |
---|
64 | 63 | | without regard to the limitations of subdivisions (c)(2)(B)(ii) and (iii) of 20 |
---|
65 | 64 | | this section, provided that the series of rate increases conform with the 21 |
---|
66 | 65 | | recommendations of the rate study. 22 |
---|
67 | 66 | | 23 |
---|
68 | 67 | | SECTION 2. Arkansas Code § 14 -234-802(e), concerning the deposit of 24 |
---|
69 | 68 | | gross revenues required by a provider, is amended to read as follows: 25 |
---|
70 | 69 | | (e)(1) A Each provider shall deposit a minimum of five percent (5%) 26 |
---|
71 | 70 | | per annum of gross revenues in a dedicated refurbishment and replacement 27 |
---|
72 | 71 | | account within twelve (12) month s of implementation of the rate, unless a 28 |
---|
73 | 72 | | different amount is determined by a rate study . 29 |
---|
74 | 73 | | (2) The provider may spend any amount of the provider's cash 30 |
---|
75 | 74 | | savings referenced in subdivision (e)(1) of this section at any time for 31 |
---|
76 | 75 | | refurbishment and replacement of the provider's water system facilities and 32 |
---|
77 | 76 | | other real property. 33 |
---|
78 | 77 | | (3) If a different amount is determined by a rate study, then 34 |
---|
79 | 78 | | the amount determined by the rate study shall be deposited into a dedicated 35 |
---|
80 | 79 | | refurbishment and replacement account. 36 As Engrossed: H3/13/23 HB1515 |
---|
81 | 80 | | |
---|
82 | 81 | | 3 03-13-2023 09:49:50 CRH143 |
---|
83 | 82 | | |
---|
84 | 83 | | |
---|
85 | 84 | | 1 |
---|
86 | 85 | | SECTION 3. Arkansas Code § 14 -234-802(h), concerning the requirement 2 |
---|
87 | 86 | | for a provider to obtain a rate study or amend a rate study before beginning 3 |
---|
88 | 87 | | a major development project, is repealed. 4 |
---|
89 | 88 | | (h)(1) A provider that plans to undertake a major development pro ject 5 |
---|
90 | 89 | | shall obtain a rate study or amend the provider's existing rate study before 6 |
---|
91 | 90 | | beginning the major development project to include consideration of the 7 |
---|
92 | 91 | | financial impact of the major development project on the fiscal 8 |
---|
93 | 92 | | sustainability of the provider. 9 |
---|
94 | 93 | | (2) As used in this subsection, “major development project” 10 |
---|
95 | 94 | | means a project that exceeds twenty percent (20%) of gross revenues of the 11 |
---|
96 | 95 | | provider for the immediately preceding fiscal year. 12 |
---|
97 | 96 | | 13 |
---|
98 | 97 | | SECTION 4. Arkansas Code § 14 -234-805(a)(1)(B), concerning the 14 |
---|
99 | 98 | | training required for members of a provider board, is amended to read as 15 |
---|
100 | 99 | | follows: 16 |
---|
101 | 100 | | (B) A member of a provider board as of January 1, 2021, 17 |
---|
102 | 101 | | shall receive the training required under this section by the later of the 18 |
---|
103 | 102 | | member's first anniversary of service or December 31, 2022 2023. 19 |
---|
104 | 103 | | 20 |
---|
105 | 104 | | SECTION 5. Arkansas Code § 14 -234-807 is amended to read as follows: 21 |
---|
106 | 105 | | 14-234-807. Applicability. 22 |
---|
107 | 106 | | This subchapter does not apply to: 23 |
---|
108 | 107 | | (1) A water system regulated by the Arkansas Public Service 24 |
---|
109 | 108 | | Commission as a public utility under § 23-1-101; 25 |
---|
110 | 109 | | (2) A municipal utility system owned or operated by a 26 |
---|
111 | 110 | | municipality that provides electric service to retail customers in addition 27 |
---|
112 | 111 | | to water service, including an electric system: 28 |
---|
113 | 112 | | (A) Managed or operated by a nonprofit corporation u nder § 29 |
---|
114 | 113 | | 14-199-701 et seq.; or 30 |
---|
115 | 114 | | (B) Owned or operated by a municipality or by a 31 |
---|
116 | 115 | | consolidated utility district under the General Consolidated Public Utility 32 |
---|
117 | 116 | | System Improvement District Law, § 14 -217-101 et seq.; 33 |
---|
118 | 117 | | (3) A privately owned provider that supp lies the majority of its 34 |
---|
119 | 118 | | retail water service to nonresidential customers; or 35 |
---|
120 | 119 | | (4) A water system operated jointly between two (2) 36 As Engrossed: H3/13/23 HB1515 |
---|
121 | 120 | | |
---|
122 | 121 | | 4 03-13-2023 09:49:50 CRH143 |
---|
123 | 122 | | |
---|
124 | 123 | | |
---|
125 | 124 | | municipalities in which each municipality is located in a different state ; or 1 |
---|
126 | 125 | | (5) A provider during the time that the pr ovider is subject to a 2 |
---|
127 | 126 | | federal court decree or judgment for remediation efforts related to the 3 |
---|
128 | 127 | | provider's water system, wastewater system, or water and wastewater systems 4 |
---|
129 | 128 | | for the purpose of compliance with federal law . 5 |
---|
130 | 129 | | 6 |
---|
131 | 130 | | /s/Maddox 7 |
---|
132 | 131 | | 8 |
---|
133 | 132 | | 9 |
---|