Senate | 05/01/2023 | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Received from the House. | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Filed |