House
|
05/01/2023
|
Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
The vote by which HB1738 Passed was expunged.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned From the Senate as requested.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned To the House as requested.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee for purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from the House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Amendment No. 1 & 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 & 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|