Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Sine Die adjournment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The vote by which SB121 failed to pass was expunged.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Motion to expunge the vote by which SB121 failed to pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Read the third time and failed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|