Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Notification that SB201 is now Act 671
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
ORDERED ENROLLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned from the House as passed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned To the Senate as passed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Returned by the Committee Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Read the third time and passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB201 failed. Motion Carried.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Read the third time and failed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|