Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Notification that SB263 is now Act 388
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
ORDERED ENROLLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Returned from the House as passed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Returned To the Senate as passed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Returned by the Committee Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Read the third time and passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|