Senate | 03/24/2023 | Notification that SB347 is now Act 364 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | ORDERED ENROLLED | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Returned from the House as passed. | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Returned To the Senate as passed. | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Returned by the Committee Do Pass | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Read the third time and passed. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Filed |