Senate | 04/19/2023 | Notification that SB418 is now Act 475 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | ORDERED ENROLLED | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Returned from the House as passed. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Returned To the Senate as passed. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Returned by the Committee Do Pass | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Read the third time and passed. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Filed |