Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Notification that SB491 is now Act 778
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
ORDERED ENROLLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned from the House as passed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned To Senate as Passed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
RULES SUSPENDED
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read the third time and passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Re-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|