Senate | 04/11/2023 | Notification that SB558 is now Act 666 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | ORDERED ENROLLED | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Returned from the House as passed. | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Returned To the Senate as passed. | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Returned by the Committee Do Pass | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read the third time and passed. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Filed |