Arkansas 2023 Regular Session

Arkansas Senate Bill SB79 Drafts & Versions

Chaptered

Bill April 18, 2023

Draft

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023