Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
ORDERED ENROLLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Returned From the House as concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Returned To Senate concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Returned by the Committee Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Read the third time and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to SENATE RULES, RESOLUTIONS & MEMORIALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|