House
|
05/05/2025
|
Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Read the third time and passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|