Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Notification that SB571 is now Act 1002
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
ORDERED ENROLLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
House Amendment No. 1 & 2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Read the third time and passed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Returned from the House as passed as amended # 1 & 2 .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Upon Motion, Reconsideraton Passed - 4/15/2025 4:51:59 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Returned to Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Upon Motion, Reconsideraton Passed - 4/15/2025 3:15:42 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Read the third time and failed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|