House | 03/02/2022 | House third reading FAILED voting: (26-32-2-0) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | House Committee action: do pass amended on reconsideration, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | House GE Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (5-8-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Assigned to House Committee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Assigned to House GE Committee | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 11/24/2021 | Prefile |