LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2026
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HB2026
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2022 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HB2026
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 28, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 22, 2022
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
April 14, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 7, 2022
Analysis
April 6, 2022
Analysis
March 18, 2022
Analysis
February 28, 2022
Analysis
February 17, 2022
Analysis
February 11, 2022