Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2030 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 19, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022