Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Chapter 198
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (52-5-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-7-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (50-9-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Assigned to House ED Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Prefile
|
|
|