Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2035 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022