Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2052 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/11/2022

                    Assigned to APPROP 	AS PASSED BY COW 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Fifth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
AMENDED 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2052 
 
department of corrections; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona Department of Corrections (ADC) for eight years. 
Background 
ADC serves the purpose of encompassing the various institutions, facilities and programs 
which are part of the correctional program of Arizona and to provide the supervisory staff and 
administrative functions at the state level for all matters relating to the institutionalization, 
rehabilitation and community supervision functions of all adult offenders (A.R.S. § 41-1602). 
The Senate Judiciary Committee of Reference met on January 20, 2022, and the House 
Judiciary Committee of Reference met on January 19, 2022, to conduct a review of ADC. The 
Senate Judiciary Committee of Reference recommended that ADC be continued for eight years 
(Senate COR Report). The House Judiciary Committee of Reference recommended that ADC be 
continued for three years (House COR Report). ADC is set to terminate on July 1, 2022, unless 
legislation is enacted for its continuance (A.R.S. § 41-3022.15). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2022, ADC until July 1, 2030. 
2. Repeals ADC on January 1, 2031. 
3. Contains a purpose statement.  
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted.  
Amendments Adopted by Committee 
• Adopted the strike-everything amendment.  
Senate Action 
APPROP 3/29/22 DPA/SE 6-4-0  
Prepared by Senate Research 
April 11, 2022 
LMM/sr