Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2052 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 11, 2022
Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022