Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2058 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 3, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2022
Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022